Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/19/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/10/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/14/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/17/2010