Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/29/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/05/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/06/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/06/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/11/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/16/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/22/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/29/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/22/2010