Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/21/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/04/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/04/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/04/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/04/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/20/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/26/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/26/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/09/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/23/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2010