Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/14/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/05/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/05/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/05/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/13/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/13/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/13/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/13/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/13/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/13/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/13/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/27/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/15/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/24/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/30/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/30/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/21/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/22/2010