Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/21/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/22/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/28/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/29/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/29/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/04/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/06/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/06/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/06/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/06/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/18/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/19/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/17/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew