Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/15/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/15/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/14/2010