Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/13/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/20/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/11/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/19/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/09/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/10/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/17/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/17/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/17/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/24/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/24/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/24/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/29/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/29/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/20/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/26/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/22/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/16/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/02/2010