Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/22/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/30/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/01/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/19/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/19/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/22/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/28/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 08/10/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/14/2010