Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/25/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/22/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/22/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/25/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/28/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/28/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/28/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/29/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/01/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/01/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/14/2010