Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/25/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/04/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/10/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/10/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/10/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/10/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/30/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/30/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/30/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/30/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2010