Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/13/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/14/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/21/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/21/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/27/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/06/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/08/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/09/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/10/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/30/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/01/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/19/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/27/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/30/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 08/10/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/16/2010