Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/25/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/25/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/13/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/13/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/13/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/22/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/29/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/24/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/24/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/14/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/14/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/16/2010