Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/24/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/20/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/26/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/26/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/27/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/09/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/16/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/16/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/22/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/30/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/19/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/30/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/16/2010