Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/22/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/23/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/23/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/23/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/25/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/25/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/15/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/23/2010