Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/03/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/03/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/10/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/10/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/24/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/24/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/16/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/08/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/09/2009