Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/20/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/21/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/21/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/21/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/25/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/13/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/28/2010