Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/28/2010