Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/19/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/19/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/19/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/19/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/19/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/19/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/19/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/19/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/19/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/19/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/19/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/19/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/19/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/19/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/19/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/19/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/19/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/19/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/19/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/19/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/19/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/19/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/19/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/19/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/19/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/19/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/19/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/19/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/19/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/19/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/19/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/19/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/19/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/19/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/19/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/19/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/19/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/19/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/20/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/20/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/20/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/20/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/20/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/20/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/20/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/20/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/20/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/20/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/20/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/20/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/20/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/20/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/20/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/20/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/20/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/20/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/14/2010