Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/11/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/13/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/23/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/2010