Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 03/04/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/04/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/04/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/14/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/22/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/30/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/30/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/01/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/14/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/30/2010