Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/09/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/14/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/20/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/22/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/18/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/16/2010