Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/15/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/15/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/15/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/15/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/15/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/15/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/15/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/15/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/15/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/15/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/15/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/15/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/15/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/15/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/22/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/22/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 01/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/22/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/26/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/26/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/27/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/09/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/09/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/09/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/09/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/10/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/20/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2010