Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/03/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/09/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/17/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/29/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/27/2010