Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/26/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/25/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2010