Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/23/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/25/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/25/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/15/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/08/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/29/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/10/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/14/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/29/2010