Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/02/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/15/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/15/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/13/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/11/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/01/2010