Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/26/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/04/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/23/2010