Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 02/25/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/13/2010