Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/23/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/23/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/02/2010