Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/04/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/23/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/02/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/02/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/03/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/16/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/22/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/22/2010