Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/27/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/15/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew