Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/02/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/02/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/26/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/09/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/11/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/17/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/10/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/17/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/23/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/22/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/11/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/26/2010