Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/28/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2010