Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/24/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/30/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/17/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/17/2010