Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/02/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/12/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/27/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/28/2010