Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 01/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/26/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/22/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/15/2010