Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/19/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/25/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/14/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/20/2010