Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/05/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/12/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/03/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/03/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 02/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/24/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/26/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/10/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/13/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/29/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/10/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/24/2010