Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/12/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/12/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/15/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/15/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010