Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/28/2010