Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/19/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/10/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2010