Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/24/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/29/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/20/2010