Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/15/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/15/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/15/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/15/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/24/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/24/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/24/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/24/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/24/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/02/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/30/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/22/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/22/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/26/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/26/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/29/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/25/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/09/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/12/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/12/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/18/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/18/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/27/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/16/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/21/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/29/2010