Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/26/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2010