Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/10/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/10/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/27/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/17/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/19/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/24/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/21/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/04/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/20/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/22/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/22/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/19/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/30/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/10/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/15/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/30/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/01/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/01/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/01/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/02/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/07/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/07/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/07/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/15/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/15/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/17/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/17/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/21/2010