Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 12/15/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/22/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/27/2010