Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 12/15/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/19/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/20/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 01/27/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/02/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/12/2010