Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/09/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/10/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/10/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/10/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/10/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/10/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 12/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/11/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/11/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/11/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/14/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/14/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/14/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 12/14/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/14/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 12/15/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/15/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 12/15/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/15/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/15/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 12/15/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/19/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 12/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/19/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/19/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/19/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 12/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/19/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 12/19/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 12/19/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/19/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/19/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/19/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/21/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 01/27/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/27/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/02/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/25/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/12/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/27/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/27/2010