Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 12/09/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/15/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 01/13/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/27/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/03/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/03/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/22/2010