Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 12/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/01/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/29/2010